+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/13
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 96 05/24/13
- Governor's action Approval 05/24/13
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter number 96
- Secretary of State, Filed 5/24/2013
- Governor approval 5/24/2013
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/21/13
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/21/13
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 52-0)
- Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF668
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF668, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill was passed as amended (vote: 131-0)
- Third reading as amended
- Amended
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 25, 2013
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, April 17, 2013
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy