+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (46)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill laid on table in House
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Senate conferees Rosen, Jasinski, Champion
- Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Joint rule 3.02, conference committee discharged
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Taken from table in House
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to take from table
- New conference committee of 3 requested
- Motion prevailed
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill returned to conference committee
- House conferees Anderson, S.; Vogel; Sandstede
- Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed
- Senate conferees Rosen; Jasinski; Champion
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- House conferees Anderson, S.; Vogel; and Sandstede.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Joint rule 3.02(a), conference committee discharged, bill laid on table
- Senate conferees Rosen, Jasinski, Champion
- Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- House conferees Anderson, S.; Vogel; Sandstede
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees Rosen; Jasinski; Champion
- Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed
- House conferees Anderson, S.; Vogel; Sandstede
- House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested
- Returned from Senate with amendment
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Order: Amended
- Third reading Passed
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended
- Second reading
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Christensen.
- Bill was passed as amended
- Third reading as amended
- Amended
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 6, 2017
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Pugh.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Howe.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Fenton and Dettmer.
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Government Operations and Elections Policy
- Author added Nash.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor