+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- See SF5
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Higher Education Policy and Finance
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Pugh.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Hortman.
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Hornstein.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Bly.
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Authors added Erhardt and Selcer.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Dettmer.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Policy and Finance
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor