+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Brand
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Loeffler
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Bierman
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Cantrell
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Huot
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Dehn
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor