+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Hornstein
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Frazier
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Hassan
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Xiong, J.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor