+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Isaacson
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Johnson, S.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Schoen
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Rosenthal
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Ward, J.E.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Dehn, R.
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Lillie
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Veterans Affairs
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor