+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Freiberg
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Hanson, J.
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Agriculture Finance and Policy
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Hollins
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy