+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading
- Received from House
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 10, 2019
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor