+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF422
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
On April 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF422
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Policy
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Myhra
- Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Civil Law
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Early Childhood and Youth Development Policy
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor