+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/13
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 91 05/24/13
- Governor's action Approval 05/24/13
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter number 91
- Secretary of State, Filed 5/24/2013
- Governor approval 5/24/2013
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/21/13
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/21/13
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 52-0)
- Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF586
- Second reading
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Bill was passed (vote: 128-0)
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF586, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
- Received from House
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 10, 2013
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 3, 2013
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass as amended
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor