+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn and re-referred to Rules and Administration
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State and Local Government
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rule 47, referred to Environment and Energy
- Laid on table
- Second reading
- Taken from table
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading
- Amendments offered
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Bill was passed (vote: 72-51)
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Laid on table
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 10, 2013
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass as amended
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Joint rule 2.03 waived
- Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Ways and Means
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Rules and Legislative Administration
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy