+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Lucero.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Authors added Fenton, Daniels, Heintzeman, Bennett, Miller, Backer, Rarick, Lien, Baker, Hancock, Lueck, Christensen, Smith, Koznick, Vogel, Uglem, and Loonan.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Authors added Drazkowski and Nash.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor