+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (52)
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- See also HF1183, Art. 4, Sec. 2
- See also SF 1664, Sec. 6-14, 22-23
- Effective date Various Dates
- Secretary of State Chapter 116 05/22/13
- Governor's action Approval 05/22/13
- Presentment date 05/22/13
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter number 116
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/22/13
- Governor approval 5/22/2013
- Presented to Governor 05/22/13
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- See also HF677, Art. 3, Sec. 1-2, 4-5
On May 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report, delete everything
- House adopted HCC report and repassed bill
- Third reading (vote: 41-26)
- Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill
On May 19, 2013 in the House:
- Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed (vote: 41-26)
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Bill was repassed as amended by Conference (vote: 78-56)
- Third reading as amended by Conference
- House adopted conference committee report (vote: 71-61)
- Motion did not prevail (vote: 61-71)
- Motion to return bill to conference committee
- Motion to adopt conference committee report
- Conference committee report, delete everything
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested
- House conferees Marquart; Mariani; Brynaert; Morgan; Urdahl
- Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed
- Senate conferees Wiger; Torres Ray; Stumpf; Johnson; Dahle
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Senate conferees Wiger, Torres Ray, Stumpf, Johnson, Dahle
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees Marquart, Mariani, Brynaert, Morgan, Urdahl
- House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested
- Returned from Senate with amendment
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Special Order: Amended
- Third reading Passed (vote: 35-28)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF453
- Second reading
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Amendments offered
- Amended
- Point of order raised, ruled well taken (vote: 73-60)
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading as amended
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF453, now on General Orders
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Bill was passed as amended (vote: 83-50)
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 23, 2013
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass as amended
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Ways and Means
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Bernardy
- Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Education Finance
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration