+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Taxes
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Grossell.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Layman.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor