+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Lee
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Huot
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Frazier
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Nelson, M.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy