+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Bill was passed as amended
- Motion did not prevail
- Motion to lay on the table
- Third reading as amended
- Amended
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 13, 2021
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance and Elections
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Joint rule 2.03 waived
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy
- Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Agriculture Finance and Policy
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor