+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Reyer and Bahner
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Schultz
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy