+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading
- Received from House
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Authors added Boe and Poston
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Bernardy
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 11, 2019
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Authors added Dettmer and Brand
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Kunesh-Podein
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Moller
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor