+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On August 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/19
On August 1, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date 08/01/19
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 15 05/03/2019
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter number 15
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's action Approval 05/03/2019
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/03/19
- Governor approval 05/03/19
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/02/19
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/02/2019
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, February 21st, 2019
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Division action, return to Ways and Means
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Poston
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means