+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- See 2021 First Special Session HF9
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Health Finance and Policy
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Mariani
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Hassan
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Her and Hollins
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Fischer
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Bahner, Franke, and Lee
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Schultz, Edelson and Acomb
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor