+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Mann
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Kunesh-Podein
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Authors added Cantrell and Bierman
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor