+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF840
- Author added Lien
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Masin
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Authors added Schoen, Dorholt and Johnson, C.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF840
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass as amended
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Authors added Newton and Freiberg
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Motion prevailed
- Motion to re-refer Ways and Means
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day
- Authors added Bernardy and Radinovich
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass as amended
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Benson, J.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Workplace and Regulated Industries
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor