+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Loonan.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Whelan.
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Daniels.
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Dettmer.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Lueck and Uglem.
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation and Regional Governance Policy
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor