+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF646
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Division action, return to Ways and Means
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor