+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Omar, Davids, and Poston.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Dettmer, Thissen, and Dehn, R.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Maye Quade.
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor