+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 13, 2015
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Fischer.
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Lucero.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Ward.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans Affairs Division
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor