+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Bahner
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Youakim and Bernardy
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Huot
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Long
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Keeler
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Frederick
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Moller
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor