+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading
- Received from House
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Authors stricken Hamilton
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
- Point of order raised, ruled well taken
- Point of order raised, ruled well taken
- Amendments offered
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, February 28, 2019
- Author stricken Daniels
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Klevorn
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Daniels
- Author stricken Baker
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Author stricken Garofalo
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Author stricken Theis
- Author stricken Albright
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor