+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Joint rule 3.02(b), Odd Year adjournment, bill returned to Health and Human Services Finance
- Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Miller.
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Albright and Theis.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform