+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 20, 2018 in the House:
- Author stricken Whelan.
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading
- Joint rule 2.03 waived
- Committee report, to adopt
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Author stricken Runbeck.
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
- Committee report, to adopt
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor