+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date Local Approval
- Secretary of State Chapter 31 05/14/15
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's action Approval 05/14/15
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date Effective upon Houston County compliance.
- Chapter number 31
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/14/15
- Governor approval 05/14/15
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/12/15
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/12/15
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Special Order
- Third reading Passed
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass
- Second reading
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to State and Local Government
- Introduction and first reading
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 12, 2015
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor