+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- See 2021 First Special Session HF63
- Author added Lillie
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Hollins
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Frazier
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy