+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 190 05/21/18
- Governor's action Veto 05/21/18
On May 21, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter number 190
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/21/18
- Governor veto 5/21/2018
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/18/18
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/18/18
- House concurred and repassed bill
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate
- Third reading as amended by the Senate
- Motion prevailed
- Motion to concur with Senate amendments
- Returned from Senate with amendment
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order: Amended
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF3536
- Second reading
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Bill was passed as amended
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF3536, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
- Received from House
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading as amended
- Amended
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 14, 2018
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Policy