+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF3569
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3569
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Dettmer.
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation and Regional Governance Policy
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor