+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Authors added West and Carlson, L.
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Wagenius
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Bly.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Authors added Kresha, Vogel, Schultz, Freiberg, and Murphy, E.
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Authors added Sauke; Koegel; Lueck; Loonan; Rosenthal; and Carlson, A.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation and Regional Governance Policy
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor