+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Hollins
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Authors added Freiberg, Frazier, Feist and Noor
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Authors added Keeler, Her, and Jordan
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Authors added Olson, L.; Howard; Berg; Hornstein; Lippert; Moller; Xiong, T.; Marquart; Long; Koegel; Davnie; Gomez and Klevorn
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Early Childhood Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor