+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On August 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/18
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 107 04/26/18
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's action Approval 04/26/18
- Presentment date 04/26/18
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter number 107
- Secretary of State, Filed 04/26/18
- Governor approval 04/26/18
- Presented to Governor 04/26/18
- Returned from Senate
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Order
- Third reading Passed
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF3399
- Second reading
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF3399, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 16, 2018.
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy