+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 15, 2020 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF3745
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
On May 14, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3745
On May 12, 2020 in the House:
- Second reading
- Joint rule 2.03 waived
- Committee report, to adopt
On May 11, 2020 in the House:
- Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Returned by Chair to Government Operations
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Subcommittee on Local Government
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor