+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On August 1, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 24 04/25/13
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Governor's action Approval
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Presentment date
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Special Order
- Third reading Passed (vote: 65-1)
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF350
- Second reading
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF350, now on General Orders
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Bill was passed (vote: 132-0)
- Third reading
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 16, 2013
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Policy
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor