+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF327
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on Calendar for the Day
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF327
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Bennett.
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 09, 2018
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
- Second reading
- Authors added Dettmer and Pugh.
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Heintzeman.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Fischer and Hansen.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Maye Quade.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Becker-Finn.
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Commerce and Regulatory Reform
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Davids.
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans Affairs Division
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor