+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Capital Investment Division
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Authors added Becker-Finn, Kunesh-Podein, Lee, and Moran
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Authors added Marquart, Layman, Kiel, Kresha, and Erickson
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Author added Persell
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Finance Division
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor