+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Kunesh-Podein.
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Fischer.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Authors added Nelson, Hornstein, Loon, and Smith.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Authors added Lesch and Dettmer.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Dehn, R.
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Jurgens.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor