+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 11, 2020 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF3255
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
On May 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3255
On May 4, 2020 in the House:
- Author added Tabke
On April 28, 2020 in the House:
- Author added Hornstein (chief)
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy Division