+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF3168
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3168
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Johnson, C., as chief author.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor