+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF3537
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3537
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Agriculture Finance
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Policy
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor