+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Xiong, J.
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Lee
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy