+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Sunday, May 20, 2018
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Lueck.
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Ecklund.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance