+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF226
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF226
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Author added Becker-Finn
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Authors added Ecklund
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy