+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF2869
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2869
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Authors added Flanagan and Applebaum.
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Koznick.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation and Regional Governance Policy