+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Dill.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Koznick.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Author added O'Neill.
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Drazkowski.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Motion prevailed
- Motion to recall and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Authors added Pugh, Lucero, and Bly.
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Author added Albright.
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law and Data Practices
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor